ABRAMS v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Plaintiff: ALVIN ABRAMS
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2018cv01919
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER dismissing case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/10/2018. (lctjk2)
August 23, 2018 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor. (zsb)
August 17, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER dismissing complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff has until September 7, 2018, to file an amended complaint over which this Court has jurisdiction. If Plaintiff does not do so, the Court will enter a final order dismissing the action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/17/2018. (lctjk2)
August 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb)
August 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5641782) filed by ALVIN ABRAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Safriet, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABRAMS v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVIN ABRAMS
Represented By: Sara B. Safriet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?