AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. ALEX M AZAR II
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL, INC., BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, MOUNT NITTANY HEALTH SYSTEM, EMH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER - MURRIETA, GOLETA VALLEY COTTAGE HOSPITAL, HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL, NORTH OAKS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER OF BRANCH COUNTY, AMERICAN LEGION HOSPITAL, FAIRMONT GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., BELLEVUE HOSPITAL, FLOWER HOSPITAL, LAKE HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC., FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM, LIMA MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEM, LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, ALVARADO HOSPITAL LLC, AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, EAST VALLEY GLENDORA HOSPITAL, LP, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, NORTHERN DUTCHESS HOSPITAL, JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, MEDINA HOSPITAL, LAFAYETTE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES MARTIN'S FERRY LLC, KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, A NON-PROFIT TEXAS CORPORATION, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM-EAST REGION, EMMA L. BIXBY MEDICAL CENTER, DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, MONROE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LAFAYETTE GENERAL SURGICAL HOSPITAL, LLC, CRYSTAL CLINIC ORTHOPAEDIC CENTER, LLC, COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. and MARYMOUNT HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR II and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv01940
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 Case reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly there is an earlier related case. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-00867-CKK. (Bennett, Michelle)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/30/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/29/2018. (Hettich, Daniel)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/30/2018 (Hettich, Daniel)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/30/2018. (Hettich, Daniel)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached standing order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/20/2018. (lcrdm2, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M AZAR II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 20, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N. Swayne on behalf of AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES MARTIN'S FERRY LLC, ALVARADO HOSPITAL LLC, AMERICAN LEGION HOSPITAL, BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BELLEVUE HOSPITAL, BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM-EAST REGION, COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER OF BRANCH COUNTY, CRYSTAL CLINIC ORTHOPAEDIC CENTER, LLC, DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL, INC., EAST VALLEY GLENDORA HOSPITAL, LP, EMH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EMMA L. BIXBY MEDICAL CENTER, FAIRMONT GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, FLOWER HOSPITAL, FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM, GOLETA VALLEY COTTAGE HOSPITAL, HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL, JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, A NON-PROFIT TEXAS CORPORATION, LAFAYETTE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LAFAYETTE GENERAL SURGICAL HOSPITAL, LLC, LAKE HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC., LIMA MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEM, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER - MURRIETA, LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, MARYMOUNT HOSPITAL, MEDINA HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MONROE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MOUNT NITTANY HEALTH SYSTEM, MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL, NORTH OAKS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, NORTHERN DUTCHESS HOSPITAL (Swayne, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES MARTIN'S FERRY LLC, ALVARADO HOSPITAL LLC, AMERICAN LEGION HOSPITAL, BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BELLEVUE HOSPITAL, BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM-EAST REGION, COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER OF BRANCH COUNTY, CRYSTAL CLINIC ORTHOPAEDIC CENTER, LLC, DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL, INC., EAST VALLEY GLENDORA HOSPITAL, LP, EMH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EMMA L. BIXBY MEDICAL CENTER, FAIRMONT GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, FLOWER HOSPITAL, FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM, GOLETA VALLEY COTTAGE HOSPITAL, HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL, JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, A NON-PROFIT TEXAS CORPORATION, LAFAYETTE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LAFAYETTE GENERAL SURGICAL HOSPITAL, LLC, LAKE HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC., LIMA MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEM, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER - MURRIETA, LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, MARYMOUNT HOSPITAL, MEDINA HOSPITAL, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MONROE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MOUNT NITTANY HEALTH SYSTEM, MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL, NORTH OAKS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, NORTHERN DUTCHESS HOSPITAL. (Hettich, Daniel)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M AZAR II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5646704) filed by FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM, NORTH OAKS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, EMH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES MARTIN'S FERRY LLC, AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER OF BRANCH COUNTY, FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL, MARYMOUNT HOSPITAL, EMMA L. BIXBY MEDICAL CENTER, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL, MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL, DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, MONROE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LIMA MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEM, EAST VALLEY GLENDORA HOSPITAL, LP, CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER, FLOWER HOSPITAL, CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM-EAST REGION, LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL, INC., JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION, LAFAYETTE GENERAL SURGICAL HOSPITAL, LLC, FAIRMONT GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, ALVARADO HOSPITAL LLC, LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER, MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LAKE HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC., LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER - MURRIETA, BELLEVUE HOSPITAL, HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, MOUNT NITTANY HEALTH SYSTEM, MEDINA HOSPITAL, LAFAYETTE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC., GOLETA VALLEY COTTAGE HOSPITAL, CRYSTAL CLINIC ORTHOPAEDIC CENTER, LLC, KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, A NON-PROFIT TEXAS CORPORATION, NORTHERN DUTCHESS HOSPITAL, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, AMERICAN LEGION HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hettich, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER et al v. ALEX M AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRVIEW HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESERT VALLEY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY PARK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNT NITTANY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER - MURRIETA
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOLETA VALLEY COTTAGE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH OAKS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNT SINAI HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER OF BRANCH COUNTY
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN LEGION HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRMONT GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELLEVUE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOWER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE HOSPITAL SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCAN MISSIONARIES OF OUR LADY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIMA MEMORIAL HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUTHERAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVARADO HOSPITAL LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKRON GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BATON ROUGE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL MAINE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST VALLEY GLENDORA HOSPITAL, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHERN DUTCHESS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSON PARK HOSPITAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARLINGEN MEDICAL CENTER, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDINA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAFAYETTE GENERAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES MARTIN'S FERRY LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KNAPP MEDICAL CENTER, A NON-PROFIT TEXAS CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND CLINIC HEALTH SYSTEM-EAST REGION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMA L. BIXBY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALLAS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONROE REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAFAYETTE GENERAL SURGICAL HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL CLINIC ORTHOPAEDIC CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COALINGA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARYMOUNT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?