SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. LESAK et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: ERIC P LESAK, GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (NY), GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (PA) and ERIC P. LESAK
Case Number: 1:2018cv01951
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UPS Delivery Confirmation)(Schultz, Christian)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rubenstein Declaration & Exhibits)(Schultz, Christian)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment By Default)(Schultz, Christian)
October 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file a Status Report by 10/17/2018, indicating a timeline for its next steps in this case. (dot)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Order: On September 26, 2018, the Clerk of the Court entered default against Defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). In its #5 application for entry of default, Plaintiff indicated that it intended to move for entry for Final Judgment by Default against Defendants after the Clerk entered default. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a Status Report by OCTOBER 17, 2018 indicating a timeline for its next steps in this case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/10/2018. (lcckk3)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (NY), GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (PA), ERIC P. LESAK (ztd)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default Against All Defendants by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Schultz, Christian)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (NY) served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018; GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (PA) served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018; ERIC P. LESAK served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Service - Global PA, #2 Certificate of Service Service - Global NY)(Schultz, Christian)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/28/18. (DM)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (NY), GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (PA), ERIC P LESAK. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
August 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sth)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (NY), GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (PA), ERIC P LESAK (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Lesak Summons, #3 Summons Global-PA Summons, #4 Summons Global-NY Summons)(Schultz, Christian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/21/2018) (sth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. LESAK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC P LESAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (NY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL RESEARCH, LLC (PA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC P. LESAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Christian David Hammel Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?