AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC et al v. ALEX M AZAR II
Plaintiff: GADSDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, EMPORIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CENTRE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CEDAR PARK HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, LEXINGTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, BULLHEAD CITY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, LP, HOSPITAL OF MORRISTOWN, INC., GALESBURG HOSPITAL CORPORATION, EVANSTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, CARLSBAD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION, IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FOLEY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-JONESBORO, INC., MARION HOSPITAL CORPORATION, COATESVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER VMC, LLC, HOT SPRINGS NATIONAL PARK HOSPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC, DHSC, LLC, GRANBURY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAREDO TEXAS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LP, CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, HOSPITAL OF FULTON, INC., COLLEGE STATION HOSPITAL, LP, CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P., CHHS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUFFTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, KAY COUNTY OKLAHOMA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, DUPONT HOSPITAL, LLC, GRANITE CITY ILLINOIS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, AUGUSTA HOSPITAL, LLC, CLINTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LONGVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, LP, ALL PLAINTIFFS, BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as SUMMA BARBERTON HOSPITAL, MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-VOLUNTEER MARTIN, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as TRINITY MEDICAL CENTER, BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as BLUEFIELD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as DEACONESS HOSPITAL, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CLAREMORE, CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP doing business as TEXAS RURAL HOSPITAL, CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P. doing business as GATEWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as NORTH HOSPITAL, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE REGIONAL JACKSON, FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as PARKLAND HEALTH CENTER - WEBER ROAD and CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as SKYRIDGE MEDICAL CENTER-WESTSIDE CAMPUS
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR II and ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv01956
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/5/2018. (Hettich, Daniel)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/5/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/4/2018. (Hettich, Daniel)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 9/5/2018 (Hettich, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #5 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, CHHS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, AUGUSTA HOSPITAL, LLC, CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BULLHEAD CITY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, CARLSBAD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLLEGE STATION HOSPITAL, LP, BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANITE CITY ILLINOIS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAREDO TEXAS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LP, CLINTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LEXINGTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FOLEY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CENTRE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, MARION HOSPITAL CORPORATION, IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION, DUPONT HOSPITAL, LLC, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION, HOT SPRINGS NATIONAL PARK HOSPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC, GALESBURG HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P., HOSPITAL OF FULTON, INC., BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, COATESVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, ARMC, LP, JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, EMPORIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, LONGVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, LP, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, GADSDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HOSPITAL OF MORRISTOWN, INC., BLUFFTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, KAY COUNTY OKLAHOMA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-JONESBORO, INC., FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION, DHSC, LLC, LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GREENBRIER VMC, LLC, EVANSTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANBURY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CEDAR PARK HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC. Related document: #5 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, filed by BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GALESBURG HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, COATESVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, EMPORIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION, COLLEGE STATION HOSPITAL, LP, DHSC, LLC, EVANSTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HOSPITAL OF FULTON, INC., CHHS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LONGVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, LP, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, GADSDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, CARLSBAD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DUPONT HOSPITAL, LLC, CLINTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-JONESBORO, INC., IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, HOSPITAL OF MORRISTOWN, INC., BULLHEAD CITY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AUGUSTA HOSPITAL, LLC, CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, KAY COUNTY OKLAHOMA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, MARION HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LAREDO TEXAS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LP, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, LP, GRANITE CITY ILLINOIS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANBURY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CENTRE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P., LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, BLUFFTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, FOLEY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, HOT SPRINGS NATIONAL PARK HOSPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC, GREENBRIER VMC, LLC, LEXINGTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CEDAR PARK HEALTH SYSTEM, LP. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Hettich, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, LP, AUGUSTA HOSPITAL, LLC, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-JONESBORO, INC., BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUFFTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BULLHEAD CITY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CARLSBAD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CEDAR PARK HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, CENTRE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CHHS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P., CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, CLINTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, COATESVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, COLLEGE STATION HOSPITAL, LP, CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION, DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, DHSC, LLC, DUPONT HOSPITAL, LLC, EMPORIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION, EVANSTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, FOLEY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GADSDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GALESBURG HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANBURY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANITE CITY ILLINOIS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, GREENBRIER VMC, LLC, HOSPITAL OF FULTON, INC., HOSPITAL OF MORRISTOWN, INC., HOT SPRINGS NATIONAL PARK HOSPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC, IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, KAY COUNTY OKLAHOMA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LAREDO TEXAS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LP, LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, LEXINGTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LONGVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, LP, MARION HOSPITAL CORPORATION, MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION. (Hettich, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALEX M AZAR II filed by DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, CHHS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, AUGUSTA HOSPITAL, LLC, CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BULLHEAD CITY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, CARLSBAD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLLEGE STATION HOSPITAL, LP, BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANITE CITY ILLINOIS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAREDO TEXAS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LP, CLINTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LEXINGTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FOLEY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CENTRE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, MARION HOSPITAL CORPORATION, IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION, DUPONT HOSPITAL, LLC, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION, HOT SPRINGS NATIONAL PARK HOSPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC, GALESBURG HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P., HOSPITAL OF FULTON, INC., BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, COATESVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, ARMC, LP, JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, EMPORIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, LONGVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, LP, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, GADSDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HOSPITAL OF MORRISTOWN, INC., BLUFFTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, KAY COUNTY OKLAHOMA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-JONESBORO, INC., FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION, DHSC, LLC, LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GREENBRIER VMC, LLC, EVANSTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANBURY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CEDAR PARK HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Hettich, Daniel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M AZAR II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
August 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N. Swayne on behalf of AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, LP, AUGUSTA HOSPITAL, LLC, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-JONESBORO, INC., BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUFFTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BULLHEAD CITY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CARLSBAD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CEDAR PARK HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, CENTRE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CHHS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P., CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, CLINTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, COATESVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, COLLEGE STATION HOSPITAL, LP, CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION, DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, DHSC, LLC, DUPONT HOSPITAL, LLC, EMPORIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION, EVANSTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, FOLEY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GADSDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GALESBURG HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANBURY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANITE CITY ILLINOIS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, GREENBRIER VMC, LLC, HOSPITAL OF FULTON, INC., HOSPITAL OF MORRISTOWN, INC., HOT SPRINGS NATIONAL PARK HOSPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC, IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, KAY COUNTY OKLAHOMA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LAREDO TEXAS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LP, LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, LEXINGTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LONGVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, LP, MARION HOSPITAL CORPORATION, MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION (Swayne, Elizabeth)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, LP, AUGUSTA HOSPITAL, LLC, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-JONESBORO, INC., BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BLUFFTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BULLHEAD CITY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CARLSBAD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CEDAR PARK HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, CENTRE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CHHS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P., CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, CLINTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, COATESVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, COLLEGE STATION HOSPITAL, LP, CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION, DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, DHSC, LLC, DUPONT HOSPITAL, LLC, EMPORIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION, EVANSTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, FOLEY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GADSDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GALESBURG HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANBURY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANITE CITY ILLINOIS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, GREENBRIER VMC, LLC, HOSPITAL OF FULTON, INC., HOSPITAL OF MORRISTOWN, INC., HOT SPRINGS NATIONAL PARK HOSPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC, IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, KAY COUNTY OKLAHOMA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LAREDO TEXAS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LP, LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, LEXINGTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LONGVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, LP, MARION HOSPITAL CORPORATION, MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION. (Hettich, Daniel)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M AZAR II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5651235) filed by DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, CHHS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, AUGUSTA HOSPITAL, LLC, CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BULLHEAD CITY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, CARLSBAD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLLEGE STATION HOSPITAL, LP, BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANITE CITY ILLINOIS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAREDO TEXAS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LP, CLINTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LEXINGTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FOLEY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CENTRE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, MARION HOSPITAL CORPORATION, IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP, CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION, DUPONT HOSPITAL, LLC, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION, HOT SPRINGS NATIONAL PARK HOSPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC, GALESBURG HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P., HOSPITAL OF FULTON, INC., BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, COATESVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, ARMC, LP, JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, EMPORIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, LONGVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, LP, BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, GADSDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, HOSPITAL OF MORRISTOWN, INC., BLUFFTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, KAY COUNTY OKLAHOMA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-JONESBORO, INC., FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION, DHSC, LLC, LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GREENBRIER VMC, LLC, EVANSTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GRANBURY HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CEDAR PARK HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Hettich, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC et al v. ALEX M AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GADSDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMPORIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRE HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDAR PARK HEALTH SYSTEM, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE RIDGE GEORGIA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAS CRUCES MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEXINGTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BULLHEAD CITY HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMC, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL OF MORRISTOWN, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALESBURG HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVANSTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLSBAD MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOLEY HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL-JONESBORO, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COATESVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRESTVIEW HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREENBRIER VMC, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOT SPRINGS NATIONAL PARK HOSPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DHSC, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANBURY HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAREDO TEXAS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL OF FULTON, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLLEGE STATION HOSPITAL, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P.
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHHS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUFFTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROWNSVILLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAY COUNTY OKLAHOMA HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUPONT HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANITE CITY ILLINOIS HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUGUSTA HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLINTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONGVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBERTON HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as SUMMA BARBERTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as TENNOVA HEALTHCARE-VOLUNTEER MARTIN
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as TRINITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUEFIELD HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as BLUEFIELD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEACONESS HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as DEACONESS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CLAREMORE
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LP doing business as TEXAS RURAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARKSVILLE HEALTH SYSTEM, G.P. doing business as GATEWAY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKSON, TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as NORTH HOSPITAL, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE REGIONAL JACKSON
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARMINGTON MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as PARKLAND HEALTH CENTER - WEBER ROAD
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND TENNESSEE HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as SKYRIDGE MEDICAL CENTER-WESTSIDE CAMPUS
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Swayne
Represented By: Daniel J. Hettich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M AZAR II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?