FREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. GOOGLE INC. et al

Plaintiff: FREEDOM WATCH, INC.
Defendant: APPLE INC., GOOGLE INC., FACEBOOK INC. and TWITTER, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02030
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Defendants' #12 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 16, 2018. Plaintiff shall oppose any motion to dismiss filed by Defendants on or before December 17, 2018. Defendants may reply to any opposition on or before January 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/26/18. (ltnm1)
October 26, 2018 Filing 20 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TWITTER, INC. (Willen, Brian)
October 26, 2018 Filing 19 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FACEBOOK INC. (Allen, Kenneth)
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by APPLE INC. (Gottlieb, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Isaacson on behalf of APPLE INC. (Isaacson, William)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James Adam Kraehenbuehl on behalf of APPLE INC. (Kraehenbuehl, James)
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Willen on behalf of TWITTER, INC. (Willen, Brian)
October 26, 2018 Filing 14 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOOGLE INC. (Schmidtlein, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Gottlieb on behalf of APPLE INC. (Gottlieb, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Entry of Briefing Schedule by GOOGLE INC. (Schmidtlein, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Goodman Hentoff on behalf of GOOGLE INC. (Hentoff, Thomas)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kannon K. Shanmugam on behalf of GOOGLE INC. (Shanmugam, Kannon)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Schmidtlein on behalf of GOOGLE INC. (Schmidtlein, John)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Miller on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Miller, Mary)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Winn Allen on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Allen, Kenneth)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig S. Primis on behalf of FACEBOOK INC. (Primis, Craig)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ALPHABET INC. (dba GOOGLE INC.) (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC..(Klayman, Larry)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to APPLE INC., FACEBOOK INC., GOOGLE INC., TWITTER, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/4/18. (lctnm1)
August 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5664678) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Klayman, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. GOOGLE INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Gottlieb
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: James Adam Kraehenbuehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE INC.
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Thomas Goodman Hentoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACEBOOK INC.
Represented By: Kenneth Winn Allen
Represented By: Craig S. Primis
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWITTER, INC.
Represented By: Brian M. Willen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREEDOM WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Larry E. Klayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?