RENEWABLE FUELS ASSOCIATION et al v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Plaintiff: GROWTH ENERGY and RENEWABLE FUELS ASSOCIATION
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY and UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02031
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/19/2018. (znbn)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their Answer by November 19, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/18/2018. (lcjeb3)
October 17, 2018 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Kahn, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of All Defendants (Kahn, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 10/5/2018 (Morrison, Matthew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 9/18/2018 (Morrison, Matthew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/24/2018. (Morrison, Matthew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/19/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/19/2018. (Morrison, Matthew); Modified text on 10/9/2018 (tth).
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Matthew Stockton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stockton, Bryan)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of CLAIRE H. CHUNG. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/4/2018. (lcjeb3)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of DAVID M. LEHN. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/4/2018. (lcjeb3)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Claire H. Chung, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, 20006. Phone No. - 202-663-6641. Fax No. - 202-663-6363 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5670812. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GROWTH ENERGY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claire H. Chung in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waxman, Seth)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David M. Lehn, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-663-6910. Fax No. - 202-663-6363 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5670585. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GROWTH ENERGY (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Lehn in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waxman, Seth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Paul Waxman on behalf of GROWTH ENERGY (Waxman, Seth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
August 30, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Growth Energy, Renewable Fuels Association. (Morrison, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5664971) filed by Renewable Fuels Association, Growth Energy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-V, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons USEPA, #4 Summons UDOE, #5 Summons USADC, #6 Summons DOJ)(Morrison, Matthew) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/30/2018) (zsth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RENEWABLE FUELS ASSOCIATION et al v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GROWTH ENERGY
Represented By: Matthew W. Morrison
Represented By: Seth Paul Waxman
Represented By: David Mark Lehn
Represented By: Claire H. Chung
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEWABLE FUELS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Matthew W. Morrison
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Represented By: Matthew Evan Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Matthew Evan Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?