FLEMING et al v. THE CHEROKEE NATION et al

Plaintiff: RHONDA L.B. FLEMING, HARVEST INSTITUTE FREEDMEN FEDERATION, LLC and RHONDA LEONA BROWN FLEMING
Defendant: BILL JOHN BAKER, CHEROKEE NATION ELECTION COMMISSION, TARA MACLEAN SWEENEY, THE CHEROKEE NATION, RYAN ZINKE and CHEROKEE NATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02041
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to BILL JOHN BAKER, CHEROKEE NATION, CHEROKEE NATION ELECTION COMMISSION, TARA MACLEAN SWEENEY, RYAN ZINKE. (znmw)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/04/2018. (lccrc1)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Todd Hembree on behalf of BILL JOHN BAKER, THE CHEROKEE NATION (Hembree, Michael)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Percy Squire on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Squire, Percy)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RHONDA LEONA BROWN FLEMING, HARVEST INSTITUTE FREEDMEN FEDERATION, LLC re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robinson, Paul)
August 30, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zsth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RHONDA L.B. FLEMING, HARVEST INSTITUTE FREEDMEN FEDERATION, LLC. Case related to Case No. 13cv1313 and 03-1711. (zsth)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by RHONDA L.B. FLEMING, HARVEST INSTITUTE FREEDMEN FEDERATION, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Supplement Bond, #5 Notice to Counsel/Party)(Robinson, Paul). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 9/7/2018 (znmw).
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5666857) filed by RHONDA L.B. FLEMING, HARVEST INSTITUTE FREEDMEN FEDERATION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Related Case Form, #3 Summons Baker, #4 Summons Zinke, #5 Summons Sweeney, #6 Summons Cherokee Election, #7 Summons Cherokee Nation)(Robinson, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/31/2018) (zsth). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/7/2018) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLEMING et al v. THE CHEROKEE NATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL JOHN BAKER
Represented By: Michael Todd Hembree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEROKEE NATION ELECTION COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARA MACLEAN SWEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEROKEE NATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN ZINKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEROKEE NATION
Represented By: Michael Todd Hembree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA L.B. FLEMING
Represented By: Paul A. Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARVEST INSTITUTE FREEDMEN FEDERATION, LLC
Represented By: Paul A. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA LEONA BROWN FLEMING
Represented By: Paul A. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Percy Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?