PHOENIX RESTORATION GROUP, INC. et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., et. al

Plaintiff: The Phoenix Restoration Group, Inc., AVSMOOT LLC, PHOENIX RESTORATION GROUP, INC. and AVSMOOT, LLC
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. dba Liberty Mutual Insurance and LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02121
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Smith, Gregory)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer within 15 days, and--within 14 days thereafter--submit a written discovery plan and a proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/17/2018. (lcrcl3)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Receipt on 9/27/18 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca4906. (zrdj)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Stuart Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Gregory)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zsth)
September 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsth)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC. filed by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC..(Robey, Daniel)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In The Superior Court For The District Of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 00496 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5685641 filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. dba Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Robey, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHOENIX RESTORATION GROUP, INC. et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., et. al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Lance Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. dba Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Daniel Lance Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC.
Represented By: Daniel Lance Robey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Restoration Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVSMOOT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHOENIX RESTORATION GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Gregory Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVSMOOT, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?