MONTUFAR-MEJIA et al v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al

Plaintiff: NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA and E.A.M
Defendant: DANIEL BIBLE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ANDREW HURON, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ("USCIS"), THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, L. FRANCIS CISSNA and JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv02131
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Based on plaintiffs' notice of dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs request to lift the temporary restraining order #4 originally issued on September 13, 2018, and extended #13 on September 28, 2018, is hereby granted. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 4, 2018. (MA)
October 3, 2018 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA (Sanders, Timilin)
September 28, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #11 plaintiff's motion for an order extending the Temporary Restraining Order through 10/9/18, and vacating the briefing schedule and hearing scheduled for 10/9/18. ( Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/28/18). (tj)
September 27, 2018 12 NOTICE of Proposed Order by E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA re #11 Unopposed MOTION for an Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order and to Vacate the Briefing Schedule and Hearing (Sanders, Timilin)
September 27, 2018 11 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Extend Temporary Restraining Order and to Vacate the Briefing Schedule and Hearing by E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA (Sanders, Timilin) . Added MOTION to Vacate on 10/2/2018 (znmw).
September 26, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 plaintiffs' consent motion for extension of time up to and including September 28, 2018 within which to file its motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 26, 2018. (MA)
September 25, 2018 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanders, Timilin)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines:( Responses due by 10/3/2018, Replies due by 10/5/2018.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman.) (tj)
September 14, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ("USCIS"), U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Yee, Marsha)
September 14, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' joint status report #5 , plaintiffs shall file their motion for a preliminary injunction and any accompanying affidavits on or before September 25, 2018. Defendants shall file their response to plaintiffs' motion on or before October 3, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before October 5, 2018. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the motion at 2:00 p.m. on October 9, 2018. If plaintiffs seek to extend the expiration of the temporary restraining order pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, they shall file a motion setting forth the reasons for such an extension. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 14, 2018. (lcplf1)
September 14, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayton D. LaForge on behalf of E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA (LaForge, Clayton)
September 14, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Wylde Robinson on behalf of E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA (Robinson, Anne)
September 14, 2018 5 Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA. (Sanders, Timilin)
September 14, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number: 4616094521. (ztd)
September 13, 2018 4 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #3 plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order. The parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint report by 5:00pm on September 14, 2018 regarding a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 13, 2018. (MA)
September 13, 2018 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA (Attachments: #1 Declaration Timilin Sanders, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Certification of Counsel Pursuant to LCvR 65.1(a), #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
September 13, 2018 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA. Case related to Case No. 18cv1923 PLF and 18cv2096 RC. (ztd) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/18/2018) (znmw).
September 13, 2018 SUMMONS (12) Issued as to DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ("USCIS"), U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ("USCIS"), U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT filed by E.A.M, NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTUFAR-MEJIA et al v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BIBLE
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW HURON
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ("USCIS")
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS HOMAN
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Marsha Wellknown Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSA MONTUFAR-MEJIA
Represented By: Timilin K. Sanders
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Clayton D. LaForge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.A.M
Represented By: Timilin K. Sanders
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: Clayton D. LaForge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?