CHANDLER v. BERLIN et al

Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER
Defendant: INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC., DONALD MARSHALL BERLIN, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC and DONALD BERLIN
Case Number: 1:2018cv02136
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 22 Memorandum in opposition to re #21 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Draft Order - Denying Defs. Motion, #2 Declaration C. Chandler, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1- Chandler Decl., #4 Declaration D. Watkins, #5 Exhibit Ex. A- Watkins Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. B- Watkins Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. C- Watkins Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. D- Watkins Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex. E- Watkins Decl., #10 Exhibit Ex. F- Watkins Decl., #11 Exhibit Ex. G- Watkins Decl., #12 Exhibit Ex. H- Watkins Decl., #13 Exhibit Ex. I - Watkins Decl., #14 Exhibit Ex. J- Watkins Decl., #15 Exhibit Ex. K- Watkins Decl., #16 Exhibit Ex. L- Watkins Decl., #17 Exhibit Ex. M- Watkins Decl., #18 Exhibit Ex. N- Watkins Decl., #19 Exhibit Ex. O- Watkins Decl.)(Meier, Megan)
October 25, 2018 21 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONALD BERLIN, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC., INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Statement of Facts, #9 Declaration of Donald M. Berlin, #10 Declaration of Steven M. Oster, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Oster, Steven)
October 22, 2018 20 REDACTED DOCUMENT- REDACTED COMPLAINT AND SELECT EXHIBITS by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 (English), #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 9, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 9 (English), #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 10)(Clare, Thomas)
October 22, 2018 19 REDACTED DOCUMENT- REDACTED - Pl.'s Opposition to Defs.' Mot. to Strike by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. (Clare, Thomas)
October 22, 2018 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Investigative Consultants Incorporated (Clare, Thomas)
October 22, 2018 17 REDACTED DOCUMENT - REPLY to opposition to motion re #16 Emergency MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, and Exhibits MOTION to Seal Case [REDACTED] filed by DONALD BERLIN, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC., INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC. (Oster, Steven) Modified event title on 10/23/2018 (znmw).
October 22, 2018 16 REDACTED DOCUMENT - Emergency MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, and Exhibits, MOTION to Seal Case [REDACTED] by DONALD BERLIN, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC., INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oster, Steven) Modified event title on 10/23/2018 (znmw).
October 18, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William Henry Shawn on behalf of All Defendants (Shawn, William)
October 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Redacted Pleadings due by 10/22/2018. (zjd)
October 16, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #4 Emergency Motion to Strike Complaint, Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal, and Motion for Order directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/16/2018. (lcapm3)
October 8, 2018 13 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 Emergency MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Seal, and Amend MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Order filed by DONALD BERLIN, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC., INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC. (Oster, Steven)
October 4, 2018 12 RESPONSE re #4 Emergency MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Seal, and Amend MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Order filed by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Meier, Megan)
October 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 10/4/2018. Defendants' Reply due by 10/8/2018. (zjd)
October 1, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel P. Watkins is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/01/2018. (lcapm3)
October 1, 2018 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Clare, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Clare, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. (Clare, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Clare, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. DONALD BERLIN waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Clare, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 6 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel P. Watkins, :Firm- Clare Locke LLP, :Address- 10 Prince Street. Phone No. - 2026287407. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5714426. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certification of Daniel P. Watkins, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clare, Thomas)
October 1, 2018 Featured Case Minute Order. No later than October 4, 2018, Plaintiff Christopher Chandler shall file a response to Defendants' #4 Emergency Motion to Strike Improper Allegations, Seal the Complaint, and Order Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file any reply no later than October 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/01/2018. (lcapm3) Modified on 10/1/2018 (lcapm3, ).
October 1, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John P. Dean is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/01/2018. (lcapm3)
September 29, 2018 5 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John P. Dean, :Firm- c/o Oster Law Firm, :Address- 1320 19th Street, N.W., Suite 601, Washington, DC 20036. Phone No. - 202-725-8110. Fax No. - 202-747-5862 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5712744. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONALD BERLIN, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC., INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John P. Dean, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oster, Steven)
September 25, 2018 4 Emergency MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal, MOTION for Order directing Plaintiff to File An Amended Complaint by DONALD BERLIN, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC., INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Oster, Steven). Added MOTION for Leave to File, MOTION for Order on 9/25/2018 (jf).
September 25, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Oster on behalf of All Defendants (Oster, Steven)
September 18, 2018 SUMMONS Not Issued as to DONALD BERLIN, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED, INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC., INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC (zmd)
September 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd)
September 14, 2018 2 NOTICE of Sumbission Complaint Exhibits by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Clare, Thomas)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5689883) filed by CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clare, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/20/2018) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHANDLER v. BERLIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS INCORPORATED
Represented By: Steven Michael Oster
Represented By: John Patrick Dean
Represented By: William Henry Shawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC.
Represented By: Steven Michael Oster
Represented By: John Patrick Dean
Represented By: William Henry Shawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD MARSHALL BERLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVESTIGATIVE CONSULTANTS, INC. OF WASHINGTON, DC
Represented By: Steven Michael Oster
Represented By: John Patrick Dean
Represented By: William Henry Shawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD BERLIN
Represented By: Steven Michael Oster
Represented By: John Patrick Dean
Represented By: William Henry Shawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CHANDLER
Represented By: Thomas A. Clare
Represented By: Daniel P. Watkins
Represented By: Megan Lambart Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?