BEY v. FENNELL et al

Plaintiff: Zafarah I. Bey
Defendant: SHANIA FENNELL and TRACY WHITE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02141
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Receipt on 9/26/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca5803. (zrdj)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 10/31/2018 or risk dismissal of the case. (jth)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order advising plaintiff to respond by October 31, 2018, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the case based solely on defendants' assertions (see document for details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/25/18.(ah)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by TRACY WHITE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Kahn, Matthew)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
September 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 005803 B filed by SHANIA FENNELL, TRACY WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kahn, Matthew) Modified on 9/18/2018 (zrdj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEY v. FENNELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANIA FENNELL
Represented By: Matthew Evan Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY WHITE
Represented By: Matthew Evan Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zafarah I. Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?