MARTINEZ-CERNA et al v. NGUYEN et al

Plaintiff: Abiero Alexander Rojas Martinez, Felipe Martinez-Cena, Marco Tulio Nolasco, Jose Isabel Cedillo Marquez and FELIPE A. MARTINEZ-CERNA
Defendant: Amercon Group Inc. and De Hoang Nguyen
Case Number: 1:2018cv02149
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AMERCON GROUP INC. (tth)
November 6, 2018 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DE HOANG NGUYEN. (tth)
November 5, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER: Upon consideration of the Plaintiffs' #6 Motion for Entry of Default and Affidavit, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a), the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter Default against the Defendants in this case. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/5/2018. (lctnm3)
November 5, 2018 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by JOSE ISABEL CEDILLO MARQUEZ, FELIPE A. MARTINEZ-CERNA, MARCO TULIO NOLASCO, ABIERO ALEXANDER ROJAS MARTINEZ (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sutter, Matthew)
October 15, 2018 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AMERCON GROUP INC. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018; DE HOANG NGUYEN served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (tth)
September 24, 2018 4 Featured Case STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/24/2018. (lctnm3)
September 20, 2018 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to AMERCON GROUP INC., DE HOANG NGUYEN. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
September 20, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by MARCO TULIO NOLASCO, FELIPE A. MARTINEZ-CERNA, JOSE ISABEL CEDILLO MARQUEZ, ABIERO ALEXANDER ROJAS MARTINEZ re #1 Complaint, filed by MARCO TULIO NOLASCO, FELIPE A. MARTINEZ-CERNA, JOSE ISABEL CEDILLO MARQUEZ, ABIERO ALEXANDER ROJAS MARTINEZ. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by MARCO TULIO NOLASCO, FELIPE A. MARTINEZ-CERNA, ABIERO ALEXANDER ROJAS MARTINEZ, JOSE ISABEL CEDILLO MARQUEZ.(Sutter, Matthew)
September 20, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zrdj)
September 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5692527) filed by Marco Tulio Nolasco, Felipe Martinez-Cena, Jose Isabel Cedillo Marquez, Abiero Alexander Rojas Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for De Hoang Nguyen, #3 Summons for Amercon Group Inc.)(Sutter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINEZ-CERNA et al v. NGUYEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amercon Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Hoang Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abiero Alexander Rojas Martinez
Represented By: Matthew T. Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Martinez-Cena
Represented By: Matthew T. Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Tulio Nolasco
Represented By: Matthew T. Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Isabel Cedillo Marquez
Represented By: Matthew T. Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELIPE A. MARTINEZ-CERNA
Represented By: Matthew T. Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?