AYALA v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: CLELIA AYALA
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02165
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 11/2/2018 (ztd)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj)
October 17, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. " Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/9/2018. (zmd)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CLELIA AYALA (zrdj)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by CLELIA AYALA.(zrdj)
September 19, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/19/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AYALA v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLELIA AYALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?