CIFERNI v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)

Plaintiff: JOHN CIFERNI
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 1:2018cv02202
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 05:8101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Bottiglieri, Joseph)
October 18, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(Bottiglieri, Joseph)
October 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/19/2018, (ztd)
October 4, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018 (Duckworth, James) Modified on 10/9/2018 to add answer due date (ztd).
September 28, 2018 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/28/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
September 26, 2018 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
September 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zrdj)
September 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5702039) filed by JOHN CIFERNI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Duckworth, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CIFERNI v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CIFERNI
Represented By: James M. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Joseph John Bottiglieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?