STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE

Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv02204
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER granting #3 Motion for Discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/1/2018. (lcrmc1)
October 20, 2018 3 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lansky, #2 Affidavit Fieser, #3 Affidavit Pasquale, #4 Affidavit Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Memorandum in Support)(Haire, Jessica)
September 27, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Filing Fee Received was entered in error and counsel paid the $25 attorney renewal fee. (zmd)
September 26, 2018 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (zmd)
September 26, 2018 SUMMONS Not Issued as to JOHN DOE. (zmd)
September 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zmd)
September 26, 2018 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ATTORNEY RENEWAL fee received: $ 25.00, receipt number: (zmd) Modified on 9/27/2018 (zmd).
September 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5702960) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure)(Haire, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Haire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?