STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE

Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv02210
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/30/2019. (gdf)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 16, 2018. (lcesh1)
October 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lansky, #2 Affidavit Fieser, #3 Affidavit Pasquale, #4 Affidavit Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Memorandum in Support)(Haire, Jessica)
September 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zsb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (zsb)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5703309) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure)(Haire, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Haire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?