UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA et al v. BALLANTYNE

Plaintiff: UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA and KEYSTONE + MOUNTAIN + LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS
Defendant: JOHN BALLANTYNE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02229
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case in light of the plaintiffs' #4 Voluntary Dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 20, 2018. (lcdlf2)
November 19, 2018 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Shanley, Daniel)
October 2, 2018 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JOHN BALLANTYNE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
October 2, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
October 1, 2018 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN BALLANTYNE filed by UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Shanley, Daniel)
September 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against JOHN BALLANTYNE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5707998) filed by UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shanley, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA et al v. BALLANTYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BALLANTYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED BROTHERHOOD OF CARPENTERS AND JOINERS OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel M. Shanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYSTONE + MOUNTAIN + LAKES REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?