MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT et al
Plaintiff: LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, DANIEL BIBLE, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ANDREW HURON, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION and L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02231
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Alien Detainee (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/30/2018 (tj)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Based on the parties' joint status report #11 , the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 30, 2018. The Court will continue to hold in abeyance plaintiff's motion #2 for a preliminary injunction until further order of this Court. As stated in the joint status report, "Defendants voluntarily agree to stay Plaintiff Lesbi Nohemi Martinez-Martinez's removal from the United States through and including November 30, 2018, or until further order of this Court or the Court in Ms. L." Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 21, 2018. (MA)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McNerney, Martin)
October 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/20/2018 (tj)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Based on the parties' joint status report #10 , defendants have voluntarily agreed to stay plaintiff Lesbi Nohemi Martinez-Martinez's removal from the United States pending a ruling by Judge Sabraw on plaintiff's objection to the settlement agreement in Ms. L. v. ICE, No. 18-0428 (S.D. Cal.). Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that plaintiff's motion #2 for a preliminary injunction is held in abeyance until further order of this Court. The parties shall file in this Court any relevant filings or orders from Ms. L v. ICE as they are filed or issued in that case. The parties shall also file a further joint status report on or before November 20, 2018 regarding the November 15, 2018 fairness hearing before Judge Sabraw. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 18, 2018. (MA)
October 17, 2018 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT. (Murley, Nicole)
October 15, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 10/15/2018 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ. Oral argument heard, and motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira.) (tj)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Objection to the Proposed Settlement in Ms. L. v. Sessions, et al. by LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ (Attachments: #1 Objection of Ms. Lesbi Martinez-Martinez to the October 5, 2018 Settlement Agreement)(McNerney, Martin)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(McNerney, Martin)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murley, Nicole)
October 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/10/2018; Replies due by 10/12/2018; Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman.) (tj)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Based on the parties' representations in their joint status report #6 , defendants shall file their response to plaintiffs' motion #2 for preliminary injunction on or before October 10, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before October 12, 2018. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the motion on October 15, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 2, 2018. (MA)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ. (McNerney, Martin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Newcomb Murley on behalf of DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT (Murley, Nicole) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/28/2018) (ztd).
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, THOMAS HOMAN, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
September 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (zrdj)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-2096-PLF, 18-cv-2131-PLF. (McNerney, Martin)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(McNerney, Martin)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5708060) filed by LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(McNerney, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BIBLE
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW HURON
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS HOMAN
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOM ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESBI NOHEMI MARTINEZ-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Martin M. McNerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?