COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION v. 1POOL LTD. et al
Plaintiff: COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION
Defendant: PATRICK BRUNNER and 1POOL LTD.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02243
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE by COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION. PATRICK BRUNNER waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Wedewer, Harry)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION. 1POOL LTD. waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Wedewer, Harry)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Manal Sultan on behalf of COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION (Sultan, Manal)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Candice Leigh Aloisi on behalf of COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION (Aloisi, Candice)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to 1POOL LTD., PATRICK BRUNNER. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2nd, #2 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/28/18. (lctnm1)
September 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02244. (Wedewer, Harry)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wedewer, Harry) Modified on 10/2/2018 (zrdj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION v. 1POOL LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK BRUNNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1POOL LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION
Represented By: Harry Edward Wedewer
Represented By: Candice Leigh Aloisi
Represented By: Manal Sultan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?