DAVIS v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F. DAVIS
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02257
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that the initial complaint [Dkt. # 1], is stricken, and the Amended Complaint [Dkt. # 4] is operative. The Deputy Clerk shall randomly assign this pro se, in forma pauperis action to a district judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/14/18. (zmd)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by WILLIAM F. DAVIS.(zrdj)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and that within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that identifies the agency decision forming the basis of this action or suffer dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/9/2018. (zrdj)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM F. DAVIS (zrdj)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED ON 11/14/2018..... COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by WILLIAM F. DAVIS.(zrdj). Modified on 11/21/2018 (zmd).
September 28, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/28/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?