DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. BOWIE PRODUCE COMPANY, INC. et al

Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Defendant: JUAN VIDAL GONZALEZ and BOWIE PRODUCE CO., INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02273
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. Case to be remanded to the District of Columbia Superior Court on 12/6/2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/18. (tb)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sousa, Christopher)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Adams, Walter)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Peoples, Charles)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Esmond Adams on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Adams, Walter)
October 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2018. Cross Motion due by 5/9/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 6/6/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 6/18/2019. Discovery due by 3/8/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/12/2018. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(1) due by 11/12/2018. Defendant Rule 26(a)(1) due by 11/12/2018. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 1/7/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 2/4/2019. Summary Judgment motion due by 4/8/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/9/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/6/2019. (tb)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: End of Discovery by 3/8/19. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due 4/8/19. Defendants' Response and, if necessary, Combined Cross-Motion due 5/9/18. Plaintiff's Reply and, if necessary, Combined Response due 6/6/2019. Defendants' Reply, if necessary, due 6/18/19. (See order for further details including the parties' obligation to meet, confer and present jointly any discovery disputes prior to filing a motion). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/24/18. (DJS)
October 23, 2018 Minute Entry: Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2018 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
October 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/22/2018. (tb)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Amending Proposed Pretrial Scheduling Order by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Sousa, Christopher)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By noon on 10/22/18, the parties shall file an amended proposed scheduling order. Both consecutive and simultaneous cross motions are not permitted. Instead, the parties may propose a schedule that combines a cross-motion with a response. For example: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due [insert]. Defendant's Response and, if necessary, Combined Cross-Motion due [insert]. Plaintiff's Reply and, if necessary, Combined Response due [insert]. Defendant's Reply, if necessary, due [insert]. The parties shall email a Word version of the proposed order to chambers by 1:00 pm on 10/22/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/19/18. (DJS)
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Sousa, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Sousa, Christopher)
October 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is hereby set for 10/23/18 at 10:30 am in Courtroom 9. No later than 10/18/18 the parties shall file their joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3. The Report shall include a proposed Scheduling Order in the format found on Judge Chutkan's court webpage, along with any proposed changes which shall be highlighted. On the same day that the parties file their Rule 26 report and proposed Scheduling Order, the parties shall also email a Word version of the proposed order to Chambers. When proposing deadlines, the parties shall avoid proposing a schedule that contains submission of simultaneous dispositive cross-motions. In addition to the requirements under the Federal and Local Rules, the parties' report shall contain a succinct summary of the case and the statutory basis for all causes of action and defenses. Counsel who attend the Scheduling Conference must be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any questions which arise and hold the authority to make stipulations and admissions about all matters that can reasonably be anticipated for discussion. Parties are encouraged to attend, but are not required to do so. Separate Reports will be stricken, sua sponte. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/3/18. (DJS)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a copy of the operative Superior Court complaint as a separate ECF entry by 10/19/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/3/18. (DJS)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
October 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zrdj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JUAN VIDAL GONZALEZ.(Peoples, Charles)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Peoples on behalf of JUAN VIDAL GONZALEZ (Peoples, Charles)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BOWIE PRODUCE CO., INC.. (Peoples, Charles)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BOWIE PRODUCE CO., INC..(Peoples, Charles)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Peoples on behalf of BOWIE PRODUCE CO., INC. (Peoples, Charles)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 006477 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5714162 filed by JUAN VIDAL GONZALEZ, BOWIE PRODUCE CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peoples, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. BOWIE PRODUCE COMPANY, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Christopher Sousa
Represented By: Walter Esmond Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN VIDAL GONZALEZ
Represented By: Charles B. Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOWIE PRODUCE CO., INC.
Represented By: Charles B. Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?