HILIGH v. MILUSNIC
Petitioner: PAUL T. HILIGH
Respondent: L. J. MILUSNIC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02282
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing fee received in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number: 4616095001 re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (zrdj)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/12/2018. (zrdj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by PAUL T. HILIGH (zrdj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PAUL T. HILIGH (zrdj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by PAUL T. HILIGH.(zrdj)
October 2, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/2/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILIGH v. MILUSNIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. J. MILUSNIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAUL T. HILIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?