MILL et al v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR FIRST NBC BANK
Plaintiff: H. PACE BURT, JR., BRANDON MILL and BRANDON MILL, LLC
Defendant: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR FIRST NBC BANK
Case Number: 1:2018cv02308
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rosemary M Collyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR FIRST NBC BANK. (znmw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Notice and Consent) (znmw).
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF SUMMONS by BRANDON MILL, LLC, H. PACE BURT, JR. (Nace, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 SUMMONS Not Issued as to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR FIRST NBC BANK. (zjd)
October 9, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zjd)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5725734) filed by BRANDON MILL, LLC, H. PACE BURT, JR.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nace, Christopher) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/9/2018) (zjd). Modified to add filer on 10/9/2018 (ztd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILL et al v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR FIRST NBC BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. PACE BURT, JR.
Represented By: Christopher T. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON MILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON MILL, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION AS RECEIVER FOR FIRST NBC BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?