KEMP v. SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN T. KEMP
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC., LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 1:2018cv02348
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 12/13/2018. (kt)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey. 28 U.S.C. 1404. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/3/2018. (lcrdm3, )
November 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 12/14/2018. (kt)
November 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' motion for extension of time #4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/24/2018. (lcrdm3, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diemer, Mary)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by JOHN T. KEMP. (ztd)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018 (ztd)
October 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to Show Cause due by 11/16/2018. (kt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause on or before November 16, 2018, why this case should not be dismissed or transferred for lack of proper venue. See 28 U.S.C. 1391, 1404. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/16/2018. (lcrdm3, )
October 12, 2018 Summons (2) Issued as to LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC.. (jf)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE, LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616094942) with Jury Demand filed by JOHN T. KEMP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEMP v. SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC.
Represented By: Mary Seminara Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Mary Seminara Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN T. KEMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?