SHAH v. SHAH

Plaintiff: SHAISHAV SHAH
Defendant: MANALI SHAH
Case Number: 1:2018cv02354
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
November 19, 2018 7 Featured Case Order. The parties are hereby ordered to appear for an initial scheduling conference at 10 a.m. on January 2, 2019, in Courtroom 2. See attached order for further detail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/19/2018. (lctnm2)
November 16, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MANALI SHAH.(Bywater, Douglas)
November 16, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E. Bywater on behalf of MANALI SHAH (Bywater, Douglas)
October 24, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MANALI SHAH served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018 (Moghul, Faisal)
October 16, 2018 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MANALI SHAH. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
October 15, 2018 2 Featured Case STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/15/2018. (lctnm2)
October 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against MANALI SHAH with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5733416) filed by SHAISHAV SHAH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2A and 2B)(Moghul, Faisal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAH v. SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANALI SHAH
Represented By: Douglas E. Bywater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAISHAV SHAH
Represented By: Faisal Moghul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?