UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER v. AZAR

Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv02364
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 11/14/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/15/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/15/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/14/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipts for Certified Mail)(Roth, Robert)
October 18, 2018 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
October 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd)
October 12, 2018 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER (Roth, Robert)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5735940) filed by UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #5 Summons to Hon. Jefferson B. Sessions, U.S. Attorney General, #6 Summons to Hon. Jessie K. Liu, U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #7 Summons to Robert P. Charrow, General Counsel, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Roth, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?