PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY and COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY/AIG
Case Number: 1:2018cv02365
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/11/2018. (znbn)
November 20, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent #6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall file their response by December 11, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/20/2018. (lcjeb1)
November 20, 2018 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY/AIG, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smolinsky, Paul)
November 20, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Smolinsky on behalf of All Defendants (Smolinsky, Paul)
November 11, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018 (Ward, Margaret)
November 11, 2018 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY/AIG served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018 (Ward, Margaret)
October 18, 2018 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY/AIG, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
October 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5736222) filed by PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Ward, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Paul D. Smolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY INSURANCE COMPANY/AIG
Represented By: Paul D. Smolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?