LORENZO v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al

Plaintiff: ALICIA LORENZO
Defendant: DANIEL BIBLE, RONALD VITIELLO, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, ANDREW HURON, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, L. FRANCIS CISSNA and JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv02366
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. In light of plaintiff's stipulation of dismissal #11 , the hearing currently scheduled for November 16, 2018 is hereby vacated and this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 15, 2018. (MA)
November 9, 2018 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal (STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)) by ALICIA LORENZO. (Sanders, Timilin)
November 8, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 the parties' joint motion to continue hearing date for plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order. The motions hearing currently scheduled for November 8, 2018 is continued to November 16, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 8, 2018. (MA)
November 7, 2018 9 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by ALICIA LORENZO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanders, Timilin) Modified relief an text on 11/8/2018 (ztd).
October 24, 2018 8 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ALICIA LORENZO. (Sanders, Timilin)
October 24, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' proposed hearing dates, and defense counsel's representation that Ms. Lorenzo will not be removed from the United States prior to the upcoming hearing on plaintiff's motion #2 for a temporary restraining order, the parties shall appear for a hearing on the motion on November 8, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 29A. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 24, 2018. (MA)
October 24, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The hearing on plaintiff's motion #2 for a temporary restraining order currently scheduled for October 25, 2018 is hereby VACATED. The hearing will be rescheduled for a later date to be determined by the Court.Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 24, 2018. (MA)
October 22, 2018 7 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
October 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/22/2018; Replies due by 10/24/2018; Se Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
October 17, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Based on the parties' representations in their joint status report #5 , defendants shall file their response to plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #2 on or before October 22, 2018. Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before October 24, 2018. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the motion on October 25, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 17, 2018. (lcplf1)
October 16, 2018 5 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by ALICIA LORENZO. (Sanders, Timilin)
October 15, 2018 4 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration of Katherine Russell) re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ALICIA LORENZO. (ztd)
October 15, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to file declaration of Kathrine Russell in support of motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 15, 2018. (MA)
October 14, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Kathrine Russell in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by ALICIA LORENZO (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathrine Russell, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanders, Timilin)
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS (12) Issued as to DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO and U.S. Attorney (zrdj)
October 12, 2018 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALICIA LORENZO. Case related to Case No. 18cv1923 : 18cv2096 : 18cv2131. (zrdj) (zrdj).
October 12, 2018 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ALICIA LORENZO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against DANIEL BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, ANDREW HURON, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616094972) filed by ALICIA LORENZO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LORENZO v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BIBLE
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD VITIELLO
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW HURON
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA LORENZO
Represented By: Timilin K. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?