COX v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: ANGELA M. COX
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02389
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: G Michael Harvey
Referring Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine P. Benagh on behalf of ANGELA M. COX (Benagh, Christine)
November 19, 2018 CASE RAMDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for full case management, up to and excluding trial. (zad)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for Full Case Management, up to and excluding trial. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/19/2018. (lckbj1)
November 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zsb)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/16/2018. (zsb)
October 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Unassigned. (zjd)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANGELA M. COX. (zjd)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by ANGELA M. COX. (Attachments: #1 Filing Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #4 Summons Social Security Admin., #5 Summons US Attorney General, #6 Summons US AG District of Columbia)(Andalman, Elliott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COX v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA M. COX
Represented By: Elliott Denbo Andalman
Represented By: Christine P. Benagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?