MS. Q. et al v. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
Plaintiff: MS. Q. and J.
Defendant: US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, RONALD D. VITIELLO, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III and U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Case Number: 1:2018cv02409
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Referring Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. An Order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion was issued on November 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 4, 2018. (MA)
November 30, 2018 Filing 29 Supplemental STATUS REPORT by KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO. (Hudak, Brian)
November 30, 2018 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT by KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO. (Hudak, Brian)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #7 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Defendants must reunify plaintiff and her son on or before midnight on November 30, 2018; and defendants shall submit a status report on or before November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 27, 2018. (MA)
November 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2018 re #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.Oral Arguments Heard. Order Forthcoming. (Court Reporter LISA GRIFFITH.) (mac)
November 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (gdf)
November 26, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR83.2(g) Certificate of Indigent Representation by Wesley Sze on behalf of J., MS. Q. (tth)
November 26, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Pro Bono Appearance by Mary Colleen Killbride on behalf of J., MS. Q. (ztd)
November 13, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by J., MS. Q.. (Attachments: #1 Koop Suppl. Decl., #2 Ex. 5 to Koop Suppl. Decl., #3 Ex. 6 to Koop Suppl. Decl., #4 Fluharty Decl., #5 Govindaiah Decl.)(Galas, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Filing 23 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mellissa B. Harper, #2 Exhibit A - Arrest Warrant, #3 Exhibit B - Bond Order, #4 Exhibit C - Removal Order, #5 Exhibit D - Order re Class Certification Exclusions, #6 Exhibit E - Fugitive Warrant, #7 Exhibit F - INTERPOL Red Notice, #8 Exhibit G - Certification of Warrant)(Sroka, Scott)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The hearing on plaintiffs' motion #7 for a preliminary injunction currently scheduled for November 14, 2018 is hereby vacated and rescheduled to November 27, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 13, 2018. (MA)
November 12, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Wells Dixon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dixon, J.)
November 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/9/2018; Replies due by 11/13/2018. (tj)
November 7, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR Certificate 83.2(g) by Katherine V.A. Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (zsb)
November 7, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR Certificate 83.2(g) by Wesley Sze on behalf of All Plaintiffs (zsb)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' motion #18 for an extension of time to file their response to plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Defendants shall file their response on or before November 9, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply, if any, on or before November 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 7, 2018. (MA)
November 6, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO (Sroka, Scott)
November 6, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott)
October 31, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (Opposition due by 11/6/2018, Replies due by 11/9/2018.) (tj)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR Certificate 83.2(g) by Abiel Garcia on behalf of plaintiffs J., MS. Q. (ztd)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR 83.2(g) Certificate by Ghita Schwarz on behalf of plaintiffs J., MS. Q. (ztd)
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO (Sroka, Scott)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Based on the parties' representations to the Court earlier this afternoon, defendants shall file an opposition to plaintiffs' motion #7 for a preliminary injunction on or before November 6, 2018. Plaintiffs shall file a reply on or before November 9, 2018. The parties shall appear for a hearing on the motion on November 14, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 30, 2018. (lcplf1)
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance and LCvR 832(g) Certification of Indigent Representation by Michael J. Galas on behalf of J., MS. Q. (tth)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 Case reassigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J., MS. Q. re #6 Notice of Related Case, #5 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym, #1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym . (Percopo, Lissa)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J., MS. Q. re #6 Notice of Related Case, #5 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA, #3 Sealed Document, #4 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym, #1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym . (Percopo, Lissa)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Baher Azmy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Azmy, Baher)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E.M. Goettel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goettel, Katherine)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by J., MS. Q. (Attachments: #1 Ms. Q. Decl., #2 Koop Decl., #3 Ex. 1 to Koop Decl., #4 Ex. 2 to Koop Decl., #5 Ex. 3 to Koop Decl., #6 Ex. 4 to Koop Decl., #7 Palacios Decl., #8 Rikkers Decl., #9 Proposed Order)(Percopo, Lissa)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-1458. (Percopo, Lissa) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/26/2018) (ztth).
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent) (tth)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD D. VITIELLO ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616095154) filed by MS. Q., J. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by J., MS. Q. re #1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by MS. Q., J. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (tth)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 10/24/2018. (tth)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by J., MS. Q. (Attachment: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (tth) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/25/2018) (zrdj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MS. Q. et al v. US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MS. Q.
Represented By: Katherine E.M. Goettel
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Lissa M. Percopo
Represented By: Wesley Sze
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Represented By: J. Wells Dixon
Represented By: Michael J. Galas
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Mary Colleen Killbride
Represented By: Abiel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.
Represented By: Katherine E.M. Goettel
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Lissa M. Percopo
Represented By: Wesley Sze
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Represented By: J. Wells Dixon
Represented By: Michael J. Galas
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Mary Colleen Killbride
Represented By: Abiel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD D. VITIELLO
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?