SCOTT v. WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC

Plaintiff: ERIN SCOTT
Defendant: WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02428
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2018 23 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mishkin, Maxwell)
November 26, 2018 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of ERIN SCOTT (Rothman, Joel)
November 20, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
November 19, 2018 20 Featured Case ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for December 18, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/19/2018. (lctnm3)
November 19, 2018 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC.(Mishkin, Maxwell)
November 19, 2018 18 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC (Mishkin, Maxwell)
November 19, 2018 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Maxwell S. Mishkin on behalf of WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC (Mishkin, Maxwell)
October 29, 2018 16 Featured Case STANDING ORDER establishing procedures for cases before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/29/2018. (lctnm3)
October 24, 2018 15 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-07675. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia. (anc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
October 16, 2018 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Letter filed by Erin Scott. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this action, on consent, to the District of Columbia. Any answer or response to the complaint is due November 19, 2018. (The Washington Newspaper Publishing Company, LLC answer due 11/19/2018.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/15/2018) (rro) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
October 15, 2018 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Richard Liebowitz dated October 15, 2018 re: Voluntary Transfer. Document filed by Erin Scott.(Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
October 4, 2018 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/4/2018) (gr) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
September 25, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Katherine B. Forrest is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Washington Newspaper Publishing Company, LLC answer due 10/18/2018. (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
September 11, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/11/2018) (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
September 11, 2018 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Thomas B. Sullivan dated Sept. 11, 2018. Document filed by The Washington Newspaper Publishing Company, LLC.(Sullivan, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
September 11, 2018 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Byrne Sullivan on behalf of The Washington Newspaper Publishing Company, LLC. (Sullivan, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 27, 2018 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Washington Newspaper Publishing Company, LLC. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 24, 2018 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Washington Newspaper Publishing Company, LLC ECF, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Erin Scott. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 23, 2018 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 23, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant party name error, party name contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 23, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 22, 2018 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 22, 2018 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 22, 2018 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Washington Newspaper Publishing Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Erin Scott. (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 8/23/2018 (vf). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 22, 2018 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Washington Newspaper Publishing Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Erin Scott. (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 8/23/2018 (vf). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]
August 22, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against The Washington Newspaper Publishing Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15483859)Document filed by Erin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/24/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT v. WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN SCOTT
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON NEWSPAPER PUBLISHING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Maxwell S. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?