CASTANON et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Plaintiff: LAURIE DAVIS, VANESSA FRANCIS, SUSANNAH WEAVER, SILVIA MARTINEZ, MANDA KELLEY, ALAN ALPER, DEBORAH SHORE, ABBY LOEFFLER, GABRIELA MOSSI, ANGELICA CASTANON and ABSALOM JORDAN
Defendant: PAUL RYAN, KAREN L. HAAS, MICHAEL R. PENCE, ORRIN G. HATCH, PAUL D. IRVING, JULIE ADAMS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILBUR ROSS, DONALD J. TRUMP and MICHAEL STENGER
Case Number: 1:2018cv02545
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before 3/1/2019; Plaintiffs shall file any oppositions to Defendants' responses to the Amended Complaint on or before 5/1/2019; Defendants shall file any replies in support of their responses to the Amended Complaint on or before 6/3/2019. (kt)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion for an extension of time, Dkt. #17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before March 1, 2019; Plaintiffs shall file any oppositions to Defendants' responses to the Amended Complaint on or before May 1, 2019; and Defendants shall file any replies in support of their responses to the Amended Complaint on or before June 3, 2019. Given the length of this schedule, however, the parties are advised that further requests for extensions of time are disfavored. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/21/2018. (lcrdm2, )
December 21, 2018 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by JULIE ADAMS, ORRIN G. HATCH, MICHAEL R. PENCE, WILBUR ROSS, MICHAEL STENGER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kopplin, Rebecca)
December 20, 2018 USCA ORDER filed in USCA on 12/20/2018 FOR DESIGNATION OF JUDGES TO SERVE ON THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT; designating Judge Robert L. Wilkins and Judge Trevor N. McFadden to hear and determine this case. The U.S. Circuit Court Judge Robert L. Wilkins to preside over this case. (See docket entry #16 to see Order)(zrdj)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER of USCA re #14 REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF A THREE-JUDGE COURT. ORDERED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2284, that the Honorable Robert L. Wilkins, Circuit Judge, United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit, and the Honorable Trevor N. McFadden, Judge, United States District Court for the District of Columbia, are hereby designated to serve with the Honorable Randolph D. Moss as members of the court to hear and determine this case. (zrdj)
December 19, 2018 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JULIE ADAMS served on 11/29/2018; KAREN L. HAAS served on 11/29/2018; ORRIN G. HATCH served on 11/29/2018; PAUL D. IRVING served on 12/3/2018; MICHAEL R. PENCE served on 11/29/2018; WILBUR ROSS served on 11/29/2018; PAUL RYAN served on 11/29/2018; MICHAEL STENGER served on 11/29/2018; DONALD J. TRUMP served on 12/6/2018; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 11/29/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/29/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/29/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/28/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service D. Trump, #2 Certificate of Service J. Adams, #3 Certificate of Service K. Haas, #4 Certificate of Service M. Pence, #5 Certificate of Service M. Stenger, #6 Certificate of Service O. Hatch, #7 Certificate of Service P. Irving, #8 Certificate of Service P. Ryan, #9 Certificate of Service W. Ross, #10 Certificate of Service J. Liu)(Wright, Christopher)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion for admission pro hac vice, Dkt. 13, the motion is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Because Walter A. Smith indicates that he maintains his office at 1111 14th Street, N.W., Suite 510, Washington, D.C. 20005, he may be heard in open court but may not file papers in this court. See Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar and the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court."). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/14/2018. (lcrdm2, )
December 14, 2018 14 REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF A THREE-JUDGE COURT. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/14/2018. (lcrdm2, )
December 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 12/12/2018. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
December 12, 2018 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Walter A. Smith, :Firm- DC Appleseed Center for Law and Justice, :Address- 1111 14th Street, N.W., Suite 510, Washington, D.C. 20005. Phone No. - (202) 289-8007. Fax No. - (202) 289-8009 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5835620. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALAN ALPER, ANGELICA CASTANON, LAURIE DAVIS, VANESSA FRANCIS, ABSALOM JORDAN, MANDA KELLEY, ABBY LOEFFLER, SILVIA MARTINEZ, GABRIELA MOSSI, DEBORAH SHORE, SUSANNAH WEAVER (Wright, Christopher)
December 12, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 12/12/2018, at 2:30 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of 28 U.S.C. 2284, requiring that "[u]pon the filing of a request for three judges, the judge to whom the request is presented shall, unless he determines that three judges are not required, immediately notify the chief judge of the circuit, who shall designate two other judges" (emphasis added), the Court seeks the parties' input regarding whether a three-judge court is required in this matter. Accordingly, the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a telephone conference on December 12, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel may contact the courtroom deputy to make the necessary arrangements. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/11/2018. (lcrdm2, )
December 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/21/2018. (kt)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall contact Defendants to determine Defendants' position as to Dkt. 10, Motion to Convene Three-Judge Court, and shall file a status report on or before December 21, 2018 advising the Court of the parties' positions with respect to the motion and proposing a schedule for further briefing, if appropriate. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/7/2018. (lcrdm2, )
December 3, 2018 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JULIE ADAMS served on 11/15/2018; KAREN L. HAAS served on 11/14/2018; ORRIN G. HATCH served on 11/15/2018; PAUL D. IRVING served on 11/14/2018; MICHAEL R. PENCE served on 11/15/2018; WILBUR ROSS served on 11/14/2018; PAUL RYAN served on 11/14/2018; MICHAEL STENGER served on 11/15/2018; DONALD J. TRUMP served on 11/21/2018; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 11/14/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/14/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/13/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service D. Trump, #2 Certificate of Service J. Adams, #3 Certificate of Service K. Haas, #4 Certificate of Service M. Pence, #5 Certificate of Service M. Stenger, #6 Certificate of Service O. Hatch, #7 Certificate of Service P. Irving, #8 Certificate of Service P. Ryan, #9 Certificate of Service W. Ross, #10 Certificate of Service J. Liu)(Wright, Christopher)
November 29, 2018 11 SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to JULIE ADAMS, KAREN L. HAAS, ORRIN G. HATCH, PAUL D. IRVING, MICHAEL R. PENCE, WILBUR ROSS, PAUL RYAN, MICHAEL STENGER, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/29/2018) (ztd).
November 26, 2018 10 MOTION to Convene Three-Judge Court by ALAN ALPER, ANGELICA CASTANON, LAURIE DAVIS, VANESSA FRANCIS, ABSALOM JORDAN, MANDA KELLEY, ABBY LOEFFLER, SILVIA MARTINEZ, GABRIELA MOSSI, DEBORAH SHORE, SUSANNAH WEAVER (Wright, Christopher)
November 26, 2018 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by ANGELICA CASTANON, VANESSA FRANCIS, ABBY LOEFFLER, ALAN ALPER, SILVIA MARTINEZ, ABSALOM JORDAN, GABRIELA MOSSI, LAURIE DAVIS, MANDA KELLEY, DEBORAH SHORE, SUSANNAH WEAVER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Redline Comparison, #2 Summons J. Sessions, #3 Summons J. Liu, #4 Summons P. Ryan, #5 Summons K. Haas, #6 Summons P. Irving, #7 Summons O. Hatch, #8 Summons J. Adams, #9 Summons M. Stenger, #10 Summons M. Pence, #11 Summons W. Ross, #12 Summons D. Trump)(Wright, Christopher)
November 26, 2018 8 NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by ALAN ALPER, ANGELICA CASTANON, LAURIE DAVIS, VANESSA FRANCIS, MANDA KELLEY, ABBY LOEFFLER, SILVIA MARTINEZ, GABRIELA MOSSI, DEBORAH SHORE, SUSANNAH WEAVER, ABSALOM JORDAN (Wright, Christopher)
November 26, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Wright on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wright, Christopher) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/27/2018) (ztd).
November 26, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Simeone on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Simeone, Timothy) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/27/2018) (ztd). (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/27/2018) (ztd).
November 26, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Deepika Ravi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ravi, Deepika) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/27/2018) (ztd). (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/27/2018) (ztd).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/13/2018. (lcrdm2, )
November 9, 2018 3 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
November 8, 2018 2 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to JULIE ADAMS, KAREN L. HAAS, ORRIN G. HATCH, PAUL D. IRVING, MICHAEL R. PENCE, WILBUR ROSS, PAUL RYAN, MICHAEL STENGER, DONALD J. TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
November 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd)
November 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5773857) filed by ANGELICA CASTANON, VANESSA FRANCIS, ABBY LOEFFLER, ALAN ALPER, SILVIA MARTINEZ, GABRIELA MOSSI, LAURIE DAVIS, MANDA KELLEY, DEBORAH SHORE, SUSANNAH WEAVER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons P. RYAN, #3 Summons K. HAAS, #4 Summons P. IRVING, #5 Summons O. HATCH, #6 Summons J. ADAMS, #7 Summons M. STENGER, #8 Summons M. PENCE, #9 Summons W. ROSS, #10 Summons D. TRUMP, #11 Summons J. LIU, #12 Summons J. SESSIONS)(O'Donnell, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/7/2018) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASTANON et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURIE DAVIS
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA FRANCIS
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSANNAH WEAVER
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SILVIA MARTINEZ
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANDA KELLEY
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN ALPER
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH SHORE
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABBY LOEFFLER
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIELA MOSSI
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELICA CASTANON
Represented By: Patrick Pearse O'Donnell
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Represented By: Deepika Ravi
Represented By: Timothy J. Simeone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABSALOM JORDAN
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL RYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN L. HAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. PENCE
Represented By: Rebecca Michelle Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORRIN G. HATCH
Represented By: Rebecca Michelle Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL D. IRVING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE ADAMS
Represented By: Rebecca Michelle Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Rebecca Michelle Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILBUR ROSS
Represented By: Rebecca Michelle Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Rebecca Michelle Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL STENGER
Represented By: Rebecca Michelle Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?