CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND et al v. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Plaintiff: RICHARD TRAVIS, DENNIS DONAHOU, CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, ANDRIS J. SILINS and KEVIN LONG
Defendant: Crawford Construction Company, and CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02548
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. An Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for FEBRUARY 4, 2019, at 10:00 AM. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 3, 2019. (lcckk1)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (Adler, Gary)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY.(Adler, Gary)
December 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/2/2019. (dot)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. With Plaintiffs' consent, and notwithstanding the acknowledged tardiness of the motion pursuant to the Court's #6 standing order, the Court GRANTS Defendant's #8 Consent Motion, for good cause shown. Defendant's answer or other response to the #1 Complaint is due by JANUARY 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 17, 2018. (lcckk1)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint by CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adler, Gary)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018 (Quinn, Brian)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/7/18. (DM)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
November 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, KEVIN LONG, ANDRIS J. SILINS, RICHARD TRAVIS (Quinn, Brian)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by RICHARD TRAVIS, CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, ANDRIS J. SILINS, KEVIN LONG.(Quinn, Brian)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by RICHARD TRAVIS, CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, ANDRIS J. SILINS, KEVIN LONG filed by RICHARD TRAVIS, CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, ANDRIS J. SILINS, KEVIN LONG.(Quinn, Brian)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crawford Construction Company, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5774949) filed by RICHARD TRAVIS, CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND, DENNIS DONAHOU, ANDRIS J. SILINS, KEVIN LONG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Quinn, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND et al v. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD TRAVIS
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS DONAHOU
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARPENTERS LABOR-MANAGEMENT PENSION FUND
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRIS J. SILINS
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN LONG
Represented By: Brian Francis Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford Construction Company,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: Gary Charles Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?