TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT v. UNIVERSITY HALL CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION et al

Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT and TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
Defendant: UNIVERSITY HALL CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION, HAZEL BLAND THOMAS, JAMES BUCKLEY and TILTON BERNSTEIN MANAGEMENT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02551
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to UNIVERSITY HALL CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION (ztd)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to University Hall Condominium Owners Association re #1 Complaint, filed by TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT.(Rollins, Lindsay)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES BUCKLEY served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 (Rollins, Lindsay)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HAZEL BLAND THOMAS served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/8/2018 (Rollins, Lindsay)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TILTON BERNSTEIN MANAGEMENT, INC. served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018 (Rollins, Lindsay)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to UNIVERSITY HALL CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION (jf)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to University Hall Condominium Owners Association re #1 Complaint, filed by TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT.(Rollins, Lindsay)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Mumford, Jr on behalf of TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT (Mumford, John)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to JAMES BUCKLEY, HAZEL BLAND THOMAS, TILTON BERNSTEIN MANAGEMENT, INC., UNIVERSITY HALL CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zrdj)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT (Rollins, Lindsay)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5775234) filed by THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Rollins, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT v. UNIVERSITY HALL CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY HALL CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAZEL BLAND THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES BUCKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TILTON BERNSTEIN MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Lindsay L. Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Lindsay L. Rollins
Represented By: John B. Mumford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?