TERRY v. ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL

Plaintiff: CHARLES TERRY
Defendant: ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL
Case Number: 1:2018cv02585
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL with Jury Demand filed by CHARLES TERRY. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Filing Amended Complaint)(Alderman, Leslie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/3/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alderman, Leslie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/03/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alderman, Leslie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL served on 11/30/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alderman, Leslie)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 14, 2018. (lcrbw1)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CHARLES TERRY. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-1733. (zmd)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5785181) filed by CHARLES TERRY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Counsel/Party Related Case Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Alderman, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TERRY v. ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES TERRY
Represented By: Leslie David Alderman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?