TRENT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

Plaintiff: MATHIAS TRENT
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02591
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/15/2018 (Byrnes, Kevin)
November 26, 2018 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General November 15, 2018. (Byrnes, Kevin)
November 13, 2018 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and U.S. Attorney General. SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
November 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zjd)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5786414) filed by MATHIAS TRENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Attachment 5 - Civil Cover Sheet replaced on 11/13/2018) (zjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRENT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATHIAS TRENT
Represented By: Kevin E. Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?