MARSH v. LIBRARY OF CONGRESS

Plaintiff: CLIFTON MARSH
Defendant: LIBRARY OF CONGRESS
Case Number: 1:2018cv02593
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to Clifton Marsh, 507 Polk Avenue, River Rouge, MI 48218; Type of Document Returned: Order dated 11/29/18; No Forwarding Address Noted. (tj)
November 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/31/2018 (tj)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order advising the plaintiff to respond by December 31, 2018, to the defendant's motion to dismiss or risk dismissal of the case based solely on the defendant's assertions (see document for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/29/18.(ah)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LIBRARY OF CONGRESS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Pugh)(Cohen, Jason)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Party. (This notice was mailed to the pro se plaintiff.) (zjd)
November 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zjd)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 SC2 008630 filed by LIBRARY OF CONGRESS. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents (Complaint), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARSH v. LIBRARY OF CONGRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFTON MARSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBRARY OF CONGRESS
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?