MONTOYA v. MTK CORPORATION

Plaintiff: JUAN RAMON ORDONEZ MONTOYA
Defendant: MTK CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02613
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by MTK CORPORATION.(Huh, Jason)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/5/2018. (lckbj1)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MTK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zrdj)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MTK CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5788243) filed by JUAN RAMON ORDONEZ MONTOYA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Greenberg, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTOYA v. MTK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTK CORPORATION
Represented By: Jason J. Huh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN RAMON ORDONEZ MONTOYA
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?