WILSON v. DOREY
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH ANN WILSON
Defendant: DAVID RICHARD DOREY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02730
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ELIZABETH ANN WILSON. (Rome, Eric)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by DAVID RICHARD DOREY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Dorey, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorey, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION by ELIZABETH ANN WILSON. (Rome, Eric)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DAVID RICHARD DOREY. (jf)
December 12, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #5 Request for Summons to Issue was entered in error and was resubmitted by counsel. (jf)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #5 Request for Summons to Issue filed by ELIZABETH ANN WILSON. Related document: #5 Request for Summons to Issue filed by ELIZABETH ANN WILSON.(Rome, Eric)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ELIZABETH ANN WILSON.(Rome, Eric) Modified on 12/12/2018 (jf).
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by ELIZABETH ANN WILSON (Rome, Eric)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Michael Rome on behalf of ELIZABETH ANN WILSON (Rome, Eric)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef, )
November 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zef, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018-CA-007999-B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5805424 filed by DAVID RICHARD DOREY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, Information Sheet, Initial Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dorey, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. DOREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID RICHARD DOREY
Represented By: David Richard Dorey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH ANN WILSON
Represented By: Eric Michael Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?