MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Plaintiff: MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: MARITIME ADMINISTRATION and DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Intervenor Defendant: APL Marine Services, Ltd. and APL Maritime, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02751
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gerard J. Cedrone, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 100 Northern Avenue, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - 617-570-1000. Fax No. - 617-523-2131 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5908643. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by APL Marine Services, Ltd., APL Maritime, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Burgess, Brian)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene by APL Marine Services, Ltd., APL Maritime, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 LCvR 26.1 Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Answer)(Burgess, Brian)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion to stay, Dkt. #11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case shall be stayed until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a revised briefing schedule as soon as Congress appropriates funding for the Department of Justice to resume work. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/18/2019. (lcrdm2, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Borson, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION (Borson, Joseph)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 12/3/2018; MARITIME ADMINISTRATION served on 12/4/2018 (Wesneski, Joshua)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/3/2018. (Wesneski, Joshua)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/29/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/28/2019. (Wesneski, Joshua)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. #3 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Rachel S. Brass may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/12/2018. (lcrdm2, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in this Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/28/2018. (lcrdm1, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, MARITIME ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
November 28, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zrdj)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Wesneski on behalf of MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. (Wesneski, Joshua)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel S. Brass, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 555 Mission Street, Suite 3000, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - (415) 393-8293. Fax No. - (415) 374-8429 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5809238. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brass)(Perry, Mark)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. (Perry, Mark)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5809149) filed by MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Exhibit 26, #32 Exhibit 27)(Perry, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARITIME ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATSON NAVIGATION COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Joshua M. Wesneski
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: APL Marine Services, Ltd.
Represented By: Brian Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: APL Maritime, Ltd.
Represented By: Brian Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?