SMITH v. GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY

Plaintiff: ELIZABETH V SMITH and ELIZABETH V. SMITH
Defendant: GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02788
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to February 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 15, 2019. (lcrc2)
January 14, 2019 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY (Kornblith, Aaron)
November 30, 2018 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
November 29, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, )
November 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5815067) filed by ELIZABETH V SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hankerson, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Aaron John Kornblith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH V SMITH
Represented By: Cheryl Renee Hankerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH V. SMITH
Represented By: Cheryl Renee Hankerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?