UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $37,564,565.25 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXXXX9515 AT MORGAN STANLEY, IN THE NAME OF ANICORN LLC et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $11,314,205.00 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXX9974 AT CITIBANK, IN THE NAME OF HIGGINBOTHAM LAW P.C., $37,564,565.25 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXXXX9515 AT MORGAN STANLEY, IN THE NAME OF ANICORN LLC, $25,002,568.63 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXX1078 AT CITIBANK, IN THE NAME OF HIGGINBOTHAM LAW P.C. and $21,113.21 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXX9537 AT WELLS FARGO, N.A., IN THE NAME OF ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC
Claimant: ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, ANICORN, LLC and PRAKAZREL MICHEL
Case Number: 1:2018cv02795
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Based on Defendants' status report, filed ex parte and under seal, the Court finds that the United States has met the requirements of 981(g)(1) and that a stay is merited. The Court finds that a stay of 135 days is reasonable. If the United States requires a stay past the 135 days, on or before OCTOBER 17, 2020, the United States is ordered to file an ex parte status report specifically explaining why a stay is still merited under 981(g)(1). If after 135 days, or during the pendency of the 135 days, a stay is no longer needed, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report setting forth proposed next steps. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/4/2020. (lcckk3)
June 4, 2020 Filing 41 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #38 Order on Motion to Stay (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Sohn, Joshua)
February 19, 2020 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT by ANICORN, LLC, ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, PRAKAZREL MICHEL. (Pollack, Barry)
February 6, 2020 Filing 39 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Declaration and representation by Jennifer Ann Gray "Leave to file Denied without prejudice - Petitioner to claims appears to have no relationship to underlying case." signed 2/6/2020 by Judge C. Kollar-Kotelly This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/6/2020. (ztd)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #34 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1-21-2020. (lcckk3) Modified on 1/21/2020 to correct document type (kt).
January 6, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to opposition to motion re #34 MOTION to Stay filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sohn, Joshua)
December 23, 2019 Filing 36 Memorandum in opposition to re #34 MOTION to Stay filed by ANICORN, LLC, ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, PRAKAZREL MICHEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pollack, Barry)
December 4, 2019 Filing 35 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #34 MOTION to Stay (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Sohn, Joshua)
December 4, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
November 14, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Sean Bolian on behalf of ANICORN, LLC, ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, PRAKAZREL MICHEL (Bolian, Joshua)
November 14, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Joshua S. Bolian certifying familiarity with local rules by ANICORN, LLC, ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, PRAKAZREL MICHEL. (Bolian, Joshua)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' #31 Meet and Confer Statement. In the statement, the Government is proposing to file a Motion to Stay, which the claimants have indicated that they oppose. The parties have proposed a briefing schedule as to the Motion to Stay. Therefore, the Court has concluded that the Initial Scheduling Conference set for November 12, 2019 shall be VACATED in order to first make a decision on whether or not the case should be stayed which would affect any discovery schedule. The Court is adopting the parties' proposed briefing schedule for the Motion to Stay. The Government's Motion to Stay shall be filed by DECEMBER 4, 2019; the claimants' Opposition shall be filed by DECEMBER 23, 2019; and the Government's Reply shall be filed by JANUARY 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11-8-2019. (lcckk3)
November 8, 2019 Filing 31 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Sohn, Joshua)
November 7, 2019 Filing 30 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANICORN, LLC, ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, PRAKAZREL MICHEL. (Pollack, Barry)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice with respect to Joshua S. Bolian, in order for him to appear as counsel for claimants, CONTINGENT on said attorney filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than NOVEMBER 20, 2019. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11-7-2019. (lcckk3)
November 6, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joshua S. Bolian, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6513046. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANICORN, LLC, ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, PRAKAZREL MICHEL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration))(Pollack, Barry)
November 4, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER for Initial Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11-4-2019. (lcckk3)
November 1, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by ANICORN, LLC, ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, PRAKAZREL MICHEL.(Pollack, Barry)
October 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 11/1/2019. Status Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
October 17, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION as to Claimants' #15 Motion to Dismiss Government's Verified Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10-17-2019. (lcckk3)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER as to #15 Claimants' Motion to Dismiss Government's Verified Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10-17-2019. (lcckk3)
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Rebecca A. Caruso terminated. (Caruso, Rebecca)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Default Judgment as to assets identified in paragraphs 3(c) and 3(d) of the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/15/2019. (lcckk3)
March 5, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANICORN, LLC, ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, PRAKAZREL MICHEL. (Pollack, Barry)
February 28, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Assets C and D by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caruso, Rebecca)
February 26, 2019 Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to $11,314,205.00 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXX9974 AT CITIBANK, IN THE NAME OF HIGGINBOTHAM LAW P.C., $25,002,568.63 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXX1078 AT CITIBANK, IN THE NAME OF HIGGINBOTHAM LAW P.C. (jf)
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT of Defendant Assets C and D by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Caruso, Rebecca)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sohn, Joshua)
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE by Publication filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Last publication date 1/05/2019. (Caruso, Rebecca)
February 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Response to #15 due by 2/19/2019. Reply to #15 due by 3/5/2019. (dot)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the government's #16 Status Report. The government reports that the arrest warrant in rem was executed on Defendant funds on January 29, 2019. The government further reports that all notice requirements have been met and all the deadlines to file claims have expired. The only persons or entities that have filed claims are Anicorn, LLC, Artemus Group, LLC, and Prakazrel Michel. As per the Court's January 29, 2019 minute order, on January 28, 2019, the Claimants filed a motion to dismiss, the government's opposition is due February 19, 2019, and the Claimants' reply is due March 5, 2019. In the meantime, the Government intends to serve special interrogatories on Claimants by February 18, 2019. Claimants responses will be due by March 11, 219. Following Claimants' responses to the interrogatories and the Court's adjudication of Claimants' motion to dismiss, the government will determine how to proceed. Furthermore, as no person or entity filed any claim with respect to the Citibank Funds, the government intends to file a request for the entry of default sometime in February 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/6/2019. (lcckk3)
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sohn, Joshua)
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to #15 due by 2/19/2019. Reply due by 3/5/2019. (dot)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by claimants Anicorn, LLC, Artemus Group, LLC, and Prakazrel Michel. The Court ORDERS the Government to file a Response by FEBRUARY 19, 2019, and further ORDERS the claimants to file a Reply in support of their motion to dismiss by MARCH 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1-29-2019. (lcckk3)
January 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by ANICORN, LLC, ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC, PRAKAZREL MICHEL (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pollack, Barry)
January 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Government shall file a Status Report by 2/15/2019. (dot)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own motion, it is hereby ORDERED that, by not later than FEBRUARY 15, 2019, the government shall file a status report indicating whether the warrant issued by the Clerk of Court on December 4, 2018 has been executed and whether any notice requirements apply and have or have not been satisfied. It is further ORDERED that the government shall include in its status report a proposed schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1-25-2019. (lcckk3)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 CLAIM Verified Claim by Prakazrel Michel. (Pollack, Barry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 CLAIM Verified Claim by Artemus Group, LLC. (Pollack, Barry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 CLAIM Verified Claim by Anicorn, LLC. (Pollack, Barry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Artemus Group, LLC (Pollack, Barry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Anicorn, LLC (Pollack, Barry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry J. Pollack on behalf of Prakazrel Michel (Pollack, Barry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry J. Pollack on behalf of Artemus Group, LLC (Pollack, Barry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry J. Pollack on behalf of Anicorn, LLC (Pollack, Barry)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/11/18. (DM)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT (1) for Arrest In Rem Issued Electronically (zsb)
December 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A. Caruso on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Caruso, Rebecca)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Woo S. Lee on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Lee, Woo)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cr-00343. (Sohn, Joshua)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest In Rem)(Sohn, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $37,564,565.25 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXXXX9515 AT MORGAN STANLEY, IN THE NAME OF ANICORN LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,314,205.00 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXX9974 AT CITIBANK, IN THE NAME OF HIGGINBOTHAM LAW P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $37,564,565.25 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXXXX9515 AT MORGAN STANLEY, IN THE NAME OF ANICORN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $25,002,568.63 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXX1078 AT CITIBANK, IN THE NAME OF HIGGINBOTHAM LAW P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $21,113.21 in ACCOUNT NUMBER XXXXXX9537 AT WELLS FARGO, N.A., IN THE NAME OF ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Rebecca A. Caruso
Represented By: Joshua Lee Sohn
Represented By: Woo S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ARTEMUS GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Barry J. Pollack
Represented By: Joshua Sean Bolian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ANICORN, LLC
Represented By: Barry J. Pollack
Represented By: Joshua Sean Bolian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: PRAKAZREL MICHEL
Represented By: Barry J. Pollack
Represented By: Joshua Sean Bolian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?