DAKOTA RURAL ACTION et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION, FOOD & WATER WATCH, ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, CITIZENS ACTION COALITION OF INDIANA and WHITE RIVER WATERKEEPER
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, FARM SERVICE AGENCY, SONNY PERDUE and RICHARD FORDYCE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02852
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the #1 Complaint due by 3/15/2019. (tg)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' #13 Joint Status Report, the defendants to file, by March 15, 2019, a response, and any objection pursuant to Local Civil Rule 40.5(b)(2), to the plaintiffs' #1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 1, 2019. (lcbah1)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by FARM SERVICE AGENCY, RICHARD FORDYCE, SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Perez, Krystal-Rose)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the government's #12 Unopposed Motion for a Stay and DIRECTING the parties to file a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this case within five days of Congress appropriating funds to the Department of Justice. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 25, 2019. (lcbah2)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by FARM SERVICE AGENCY, RICHARD FORDYCE, SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Perez, Krystal-Rose)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Christian Duffy on behalf of All Defendants (Duffy, Sean)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystal-Rose Perez on behalf of All Defendants (Perez, Krystal-Rose)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's #9 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Culpepper may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 15, 2019. (lcbah1)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jessica Culpepper, :Firm- Public Justice, :Address- 1620 L Street, NW, Suite 630, Washington, DC 20036. Phone No. - (202) 797-8600. Fax No. - (202) 232-7203 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5888119. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DAKOTA RURAL ACTION (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jessica Culpepper)(Muraskin, David)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Muraskin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Muraskin, David)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/8/2019. (Waltz, Daniel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina R. Stella on behalf of ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, CITIZENS ACTION COALITION OF INDIANA, FOOD & WATER WATCH, INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT (Stella, Cristina)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 10, 2018. (lcbah1)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to FARM SERVICE AGENCY, RICHARD FORDYCE, SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj)
December 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrdj)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS, CITIZENS ACTION COALITION OF INDIANA, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION, FOOD & WATER WATCH, INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT, WHITE RIVER WATERKEEPER (Waltz, Daniel)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1714. (Waltz, Daniel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/19/2018) (znmw).
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5823308) filed by WHITE RIVER WATERKEEPER, IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT, FOOD & WATER WATCH, INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY, ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, CITIZENS ACTION COALITION OF INDIANA, DAKOTA RURAL ACTION, ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons US Attorney for DC, #4 Summons USDA, #5 Summons Secretary of Agriculture, #6 Summons Farm Service Agency, #7 Summons Administrator of Farm Service Agency)(Waltz, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/7/2018) (zrdj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAKOTA RURAL ACTION et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION OF IRRITATED RESIDENTS
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAKOTA RURAL ACTION
Represented By: Jessica Culpepper
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOOD & WATER WATCH
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INSTITUTE FOR AGRICULTURE AND TRADE POLICY
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS ACTION COALITION OF INDIANA
Represented By: Daniel H. Waltz
Represented By: Cristina R. Stella
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITE RIVER WATERKEEPER
Represented By: David S. Muraskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARM SERVICE AGENCY
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONNY PERDUE
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD FORDYCE
Represented By: Krystal-Rose Perez
Represented By: Sean Christian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?