UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC. v. UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC.

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02856
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC.. (Ervin, David)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendant's #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is extended to February 18, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court about the status of the parties' discussions by February 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/18/2019. (lctjk1)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ervin, David)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, Defendant's #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by January 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/21/2018. (lctjk1)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shari Ross Lahlou on behalf of UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC. (Ross Lahlou, Shari)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jeffrey Ervin on behalf of UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC. (Ervin, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC. (Ervin, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ervin, David)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 #5 #6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Robert L. Raskopf, Todd S. Anten, and Julia M. Beskin are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/12/2018. (lctjk1)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark.. (Lerner, Scott)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC. served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018 (Lerner, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zef, )
December 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julia M. Beskin, :Firm- Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, :Address- 51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor. Phone No. - 212-849-7000. Fax No. - 212-849-7100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5823941. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia M. Beskin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lerner, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Todd Anten, :Firm- Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, :Address- 51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor. Phone No. - 212-849-7000. Fax No. - 212-849-7100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5823932. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Anten, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lerner, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert L. Raskopf, :Firm- Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, :Address- 51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor. Phone No. - 212-849-7000. Fax No. - 212-849-7100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5823931. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert L. Raskopf, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lerner, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC. (Lerner, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Lerner on behalf of UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC. (Lerner, Scott)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5823882) filed by UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Lerner, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC. v. UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Scott E. Lerner
Represented By: Robert L. Raskopf
Represented By: Todd Steven Anten
Represented By: Julia Marie Beskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC.
Represented By: Shari Ross Lahlou
Represented By: David Jeffrey Ervin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?