CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. ZINKE et al

Plaintiff: HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY and HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE and RYAN ZINKE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02857
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 16:1540
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff Natural Resources Defense Council's #6 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Stephen Zak Smith may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiff Natural Resources Defense Council in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 14, 2018. (lcbah3)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Zak Smith, :Firm- NRDC, :Address- 1314 2nd Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401. Phone No. - (310) 434-2334. Fax No. - (310) 434-2399 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5838911. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanerib, Tanya)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 10, 2018. (lcbah3)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Elizabeth Frostic on behalf of HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES (Frostic, Anna)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (zef, )
December 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5823930) filed by NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES, HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons (Sanerib, Tanya) Modified on 12/7/2018 (zef, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. ZINKE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN ZINKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMANE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Tanya Sanerib
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Frostic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
Represented By: Tanya Sanerib
Represented By: Stephen Zak Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Tanya Sanerib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMANE SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Tanya Sanerib
Represented By: Anna Elizabeth Frostic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?