SIERRA CLUB et al v. U.S. NIELSON et al

Plaintiff: SOUTHERN BORDER COMMUNITIES COALITION and SIERRA CLUB
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02877
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SIERRA CLUB, SOUTHERN BORDER COMMUNITIES COALITION. Attorney Zachary Fabish terminated. (Fabish, Zachary)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Laureign Williams on behalf of SIERRA CLUB, SOUTHERN BORDER COMMUNITIES COALITION (Williams, Susan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Fabish on behalf of SIERRA CLUB, SOUTHERN BORDER COMMUNITIES COALITION (Fabish, Zachary) Modified on 1/29/2019 ECF was not used by the attorney on the Notice (zrdj).
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/17/2019. (Fabish, Zachary)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2019. (Fabish, Zachary)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
January 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #9 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error as a duplicate entry to #7 . Docket Entry No. #7 reinstated only as to the Federal Defendants. (jf)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Fabish, Zachary) Modified on 1/10/2019 (jf).
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by SIERRA CLUB.(Fabish, Zachary)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as to the attorney of record. Counsel must select all parties served ( USAG, USA & Federal Dfts) (jf)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN served on 12/20/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/19/2018 (Williams, Susan) Modified on 1/4/2019 to reinstate filing (jf).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/11/2018. (lckbj1)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
December 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (zef, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (zef, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-00655. (zef, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5828704) filed by SIERRA CLUB et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/11/2018) (zef, ). Modified on 12/11/2018 (zef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIERRA CLUB et al v. U.S. NIELSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHERN BORDER COMMUNITIES COALITION
Represented By: Zachary Fabish
Represented By: Susan Laureign Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Zachary Fabish
Represented By: Susan Laureign Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?