WINNEBAGO TRIBE OF NEBRASKA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al

Plaintiff: WINNEBAGO TRIBE OF NEBRASKA
Defendant: MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE, ALEX M. AZAR, II, RYAN ZINKE and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02878
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/17/2018. (Fenner, Brandt)
January 10, 2019 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2019. (Fenner, Brandt)
January 10, 2019 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/20/2018; MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE served on 12/14/2018; RYAN ZINKE served on 12/17/2018 (Fenner, Brandt)
December 11, 2018 3 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE, RYAN ZINKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
December 11, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb)
December 10, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Ann Marks on behalf of WINNEBAGO TRIBE OF NEBRASKA (Marks, Patricia)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE, RYAN ZINKE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5828797) filed by WINNEBAGO TRIBE OF NEBRASKA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Alex Azar, #3 Summons Michael Weahkee, #4 Summons Attorney General of the United States, #5 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #6 Summons Ryan Zinke)(Fenner, Brandt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WINNEBAGO TRIBE OF NEBRASKA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL D. WEAHKEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN ZINKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINNEBAGO TRIBE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: Brandt Benjamin Fenner
Represented By: Patricia Ann Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?