DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC v. MCN BUILD, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC
Defendant: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, INC., ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. and MCN BUILD, INC.
Counter Defendant: WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02947
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (tth)
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan M. Mannering on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC (Mannering, Evan)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY by MCN BUILD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Ward 7 Subcontract, #2 Exhibit 2: Ward 8 Subcontract, #3 Exhibit 3: Ward 7 Performance Bond, #4 Exhibit 4: Ward 8 Performance Bond, #5 Summons Civil Summons to Counterclaim Defendant WestChester Fire Insurance Company)(Hutchins, Sarah)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/16/19. (lcrjl3)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (Hutchins, Sarah)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, INC. (Hutchins, Sarah)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, INC., ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, INC..(Hutchins, Sarah) (Modified on 1/17/2019 to remove MCN Build, Inc. as a filer) (zrdj).
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, INC., ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchins, Sarah)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah F. Hutchins on behalf of All Defendants (Hutchins, Sarah)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC. MCN BUILD, INC. waiver sent on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Busen, Carey) Modified on 1/4/2019 to correct service/answer date (jf).
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019 (Busen, Carey)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, INC. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019 (Busen, Carey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laurin D. Quiat, :Firm- Baker & Hostetler LLP, :Address- lquiat@bakerlaw.com. Phone No. - (303) 764-4136. Fax No. - (303) 861-7805 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5854227. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Busen, Carey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, INC., MCN BUILD, INC., ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 ERRATA corrected summons by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC #1 Complaint, filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC. (Busen, Carey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 ERRATA of summons by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC #1 Complaint, filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC. (Busen, Carey)
December 19, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zmd)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5839895) filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Busen, Carey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC v. MCN BUILD, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND, INC.
Represented By: Sarah F. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Sarah F. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCN BUILD, INC.
Represented By: Sarah F. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF Z-MODULAR, LLC
Represented By: Carey S. Busen
Represented By: Evan M. Mannering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?