HIRSCH v. WORLDNETDAILY.COM, INC.

Plaintiff: STEVEN HIRSCH
Defendant: WORLDNETDAILY.COM, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02979
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WORLDNETDAILY.COM, INC. served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019 (Rothman, Joel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to WORLDNETDAILY.COM, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
December 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Rothman, Joel) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/4/2019) (znmw).
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STEVEN HIRSCH (Rothman, Joel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against WORLDNETDAILY.COM, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5844489) filed by STEVEN HIRSCH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIRSCH v. WORLDNETDAILY.COM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLDNETDAILY.COM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HIRSCH
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?