GAVIN v. CONGRESSIONAL BANK
Plaintiff: PATRICIA GAVIN
Defendant: CONGRESSIONAL BANK, MICHAEL HANSEN, ALISA HILDITCH, AMERICA'S CHOICE TITLE COMPANY and JOE YOUNG
Case Number: 1:2018cv03001
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE affirming that Congressional Bank has not yet been served by CONGRESSIONAL BANK (Sadler, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Civil Statement from Plaintiff PATRICIA GAVIN. (tth)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the plaintiff's #9 Second Amended Complaint. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff's #1 Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #6 Request for Reform to Modify Contract, and #7 Notice of FREC Complaint with Request for Reform to Modify Contract and Request for Emergency Hearing are VACATED AS MOOT. In her Second Amended Complaint, the plaintiff states that she seeks a preliminary injunction. See Dkt. 9, Paragraph 7. The Court directs the plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, to Local Civil Rule 56.1(c), which provides that "[a]n application for a preliminary injunction shall be made in a document separate from the complaint." Accordingly, the plaintiff's request will not be considered unless and until it is made in a separate filing. In addition, the Court directs the plaintiff to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, which sets forth the requirements for service of process and proof of service. In the event that a preliminary injunction hearing is scheduled in this matter, the Court advises the plaintiff of her responsibility to serve the defendants promptly and to promptly file proof of service with the Court. If proof of service in accordance with Rule 4 is not filed in time to give the defendants in this case an opportunity to file briefs in advance of any preliminary injunction hearing, the Court will consider continuing such a hearing until all defendants have been properly served. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 24, 2019. (lcdlf1)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CONGRESSIONAL BANK, JOE YOUNG, MICHAEL HANSEN, AMERICA'S CHOICE TITLE COMPANY, ALISA HILDITCH filed by PATRICIA GAVIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C) (tth)
December 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich: Telephone Conference held on 12/28/2018. Plaintiff's Oral Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint heard and GRANTED by the Court. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (jl)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Modify, MOTION for Extension of Time to by PATRICIA GAVIN (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing by PATRICIA GAVIN. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (tth)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot the plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Because the plaintiff has already paid the filing fee in this action, it is ORDERED that his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 27, 2018. (lcdlf1)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Darren Sadler on behalf of CONGRESSIONAL BANK (Sadler, John)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Modify CONTRACT, MOTION for EMERGENCY Hearing by PATRICIA GAVIN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4)(zrdj)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by PATRICIA GAVIN re #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint (zrdj)
December 26, 2018 Summons (1) Issued as to CONGRESSIONAL BANK. (zsb)
December 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
December 26, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number: 4616096037. (zsb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CONGRESSIONAL BANK filed by PATRICIA GAVIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zrdj)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PATRICIA GAVIN (zsb) (zrdj).
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONGRESSIONAL BANK filed by PATRICIA GAVIN.(zsb) (zrdj).
December 19, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/19/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAVIN v. CONGRESSIONAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA GAVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONGRESSIONAL BANK
Represented By: John Darren Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISA HILDITCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICA'S CHOICE TITLE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?